Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/09/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/09/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/09/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/09/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/09/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/09/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/14/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/04/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/04/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/05/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/05/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/11/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/11/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/19/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/19/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/19/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/19/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/19/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/23/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/23/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/08/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/08/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/14/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/14/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/23/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 12/08/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/08/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/06/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/06/2006