Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/28/2006