Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/06/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/06/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/06/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/06/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/06/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/12/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/12/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/12/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/12/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/13/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/13/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/13/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/13/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/13/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/19/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/19/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/19/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/20/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/20/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/20/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/20/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/20/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/27/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/27/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/03/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/11/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/11/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/11/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/24/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/27/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/27/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/30/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/12/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/14/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/19/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/21/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/14/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/25/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/03/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew