Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/18/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/24/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/25/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/25/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/02/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/02/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/02/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/04/2006