Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/29/2005