There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Torture Outsourcing Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the transfer or return of persons by the United States, for the purpose of detention, interrogation, trial, or otherwise, to countries where torture or other inhuman treatment of persons occurs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/17/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/17/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Human Rights and International Relations.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
02/18/2005Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E282-283)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/17/2005Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/17/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/01/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/01/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/01/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/14/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/14/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/14/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/16/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/06/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/26/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/25/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/16/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/08/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/12/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/19/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/19/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/26/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/13/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/17/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/27/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations02/17/2005 Referred to
House International Relations Subcommittee on Africa, Global Human Rights and International Operations03/17/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.952.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.952. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/17/2005)

Torture Outsourcing Prevention Act - Directs the Secretary of State to submit to the appropriate congressional committees an annual list of countries where there are substantial grounds for believing that torture, cruel, or degrading treatment is commonly used in the detention or interrogation of individuals.

Prohibits the direct or indirect transfer or return of persons by the United States for the purpose of detention, interrogation, trial, or otherwise to a listed country. Sets forth conditions under which: (1) the Secretary may waive such transfer prohibition; and (2) a treaty-based transfer may occur.

Amends the Foreign Affairs Reform and Restructuring Act of 1998 to direct the appropriate Government agencies to prescribe regulations to implement U.S. obligations under the United Nations (UN) Convention Against Torture and Other Cruel, Inhuman or Degrading Treatment or Punishment.