Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/01/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/01/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/01/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/14/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/14/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/14/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/16/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/06/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/26/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/25/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/16/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/08/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/12/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/19/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/19/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/26/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/13/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/17/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/27/2006