Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/10/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/25/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/25/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/28/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/13/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/19/2006