Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/04/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/18/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/07/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/07/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/07/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/15/2006