Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/14/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/12/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/12/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/12/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/12/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/12/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/12/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/12/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/12/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/14/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/21/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/21/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/21/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/27/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/27/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/27/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/27/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/28/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/28/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/05/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/23/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/23/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/23/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/23/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/23/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/23/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/23/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/23/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/07/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/07/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 06/07/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/08/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/22/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/24/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/12/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/12/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/12/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/12/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/28/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/27/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 10/18/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/01/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/14/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/14/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/08/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/08/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/29/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/06/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/16/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/07/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/13/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/06/2006