Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/09/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/15/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/15/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/16/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/13/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/11/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/11/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/23/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/13/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/13/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/13/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/13/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/15/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/16/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/24/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/19/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/20/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/20/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/21/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/22/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/14/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/22/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/27/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/18/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/03/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/01/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/01/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/01/2006
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/08/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/08/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/28/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/29/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/12/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/17/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/13/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/27/2006