Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/01/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/14/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/05/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/05/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 04/28/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/28/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/24/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/22/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/22/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/23/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/23/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/23/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/23/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/29/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/28/2005