Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/09/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/09/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/16/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/16/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/18/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/18/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/18/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/18/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/18/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/28/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/28/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/08/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/08/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/26/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/26/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/26/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/26/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/26/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/15/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/15/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/15/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/15/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/15/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/15/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/15/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/15/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/15/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/15/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/15/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/15/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/15/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/15/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/15/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/15/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/15/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/15/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/15/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/12/2006