Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/14/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/05/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/20/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/25/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/08/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/07/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/01/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/02/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/02/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/02/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/08/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/15/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/03/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/07/2006