Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/16/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/16/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/16/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/16/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/16/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/06/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/06/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/12/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/14/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/21/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/04/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/04/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/18/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/19/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/19/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/23/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/23/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/24/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/24/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/24/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/24/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 06/07/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/14/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/21/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/26/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/06/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/06/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/06/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/08/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/19/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/20/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 10/17/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/01/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/04/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/06/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/31/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/31/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/07/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/08/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/13/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/04/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/04/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/06/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/19/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/28/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/13/2006