Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/08/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/15/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/15/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/26/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/26/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/26/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/10/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/08/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/19/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/21/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/08/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/07/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/24/2006