Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/05/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/05/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/05/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/06/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/06/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/06/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/12/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/12/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/12/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/14/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/14/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/20/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/27/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/27/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/27/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/03/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/03/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/03/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/12/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/12/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/14/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/27/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/15/2005