Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/10/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/10/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/10/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/10/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/10/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/10/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/17/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/17/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/17/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/17/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/17/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/13/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/13/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/21/2005