Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/12/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/13/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/20/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/26/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/26/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/16/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/01/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/28/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/06/2006