Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/27/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/13/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/15/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/20/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/22/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/22/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/22/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/22/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/22/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/28/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/13/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/13/2005

Show cosponsors who withdrew