Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/11/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 05/24/2005