Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/04/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/04/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/04/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/10/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/11/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/11/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/11/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/12/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/12/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/17/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/24/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/25/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/25/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/21/2005