Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/10/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/10/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/10/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/11/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/11/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/11/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/11/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/11/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/11/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/16/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/21/2005