There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the 57th anniversary of the independence of the State of Israel.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/23/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 397 - 0 (Roll no. 202).(text: CR H3724-3725)
05/11/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
05/24/2005SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
05/23/2005-7:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/23/2005-7:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 397 - 0 (Roll no. 202). (text: CR H3724-3725)
05/23/2005-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3745-3746)
05/23/2005-4:16pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/23/2005-4:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 149.
05/23/2005-4:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3724-3728)
05/23/2005-4:00pmHouseMs. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
05/18/2005HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: House International Relations Subcommittee on Middle East and Central Asia
05/18/2005HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House International Relations Subcommittee on Middle East and Central Asia
05/18/2005HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
05/18/2005HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/11/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and Central Asia.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
05/11/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
05/11/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/17/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/17/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/17/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/17/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/17/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/17/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/17/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/17/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/17/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/17/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/17/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/17/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/17/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/18/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/18/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/18/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/18/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/18/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/18/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/18/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/18/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/18/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/18/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/18/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/18/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/19/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/19/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/19/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations05/11/2005 Referred to
05/18/2005 Markup by
House International Relations Subcommittee on Middle East and Central Asia05/11/2005 Referred to
05/18/2005 Markup by
05/18/2005 Reported by
Senate Foreign Relations05/24/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.149. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/23/2005)

Recognizes the independence of the State of Israel as a significant event in providing refuge and a national homeland for the Jewish people, and congratulates the people of Israel as they celebrate the 57th anniversary of Israel's independence.

Praises the efforts of President George W. Bush and Prime Minister Ariel Sharon to create the conditions for Middle East peace.

Commends the bipartisan commitment of all administrations and Congresses since 1948 to stand by Israel and work for its security and well-being.