Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/15/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/15/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/15/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/15/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/15/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/15/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/15/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/15/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/15/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/16/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/16/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/16/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/16/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/16/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/16/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/16/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/22/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 06/22/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/22/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/22/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/22/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/12/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/12/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/12/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/12/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/12/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/29/2005