Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/18/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/18/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/18/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/18/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/09/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/28/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/08/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/06/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/14/2006