Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/19/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/23/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/23/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/23/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/24/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/26/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/13/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/13/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/13/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/13/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/13/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/13/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/13/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/13/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/13/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/13/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/15/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/15/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/15/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/15/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/15/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/15/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/15/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/15/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/15/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/15/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/15/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/15/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/15/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 06/16/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/17/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/17/2005