Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/07/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/07/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/09/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/14/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/16/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/16/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/16/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/16/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/17/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/20/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/20/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/24/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/24/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/28/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/28/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/11/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/12/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/22/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/06/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/06/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/22/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/22/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/22/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/18/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/20/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/28/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/06/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/28/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/27/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/04/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/13/2006