Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/27/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/27/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/27/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/27/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/27/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/27/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/27/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/27/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/27/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/27/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/27/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/27/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/27/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/27/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/27/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/27/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/27/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/27/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/27/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/27/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/27/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/27/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/27/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/27/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/27/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/27/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/27/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/28/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/29/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/29/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/30/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/30/2005