Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/21/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/21/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/21/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/21/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/21/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/21/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/30/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/30/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/30/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/13/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/13/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/29/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/29/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/13/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/20/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/27/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/27/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/28/2005