Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/20/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/20/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/20/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/20/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/06/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/06/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/06/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/06/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/06/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/06/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/06/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/06/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/06/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/18/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/18/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/01/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/17/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/17/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/04/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/09/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/26/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/27/2006