There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the grave concern of Congress regarding the continuing gross violations of human rights and civil liberties of the Syrian and Lebanese people by the Government of the Syrian Arab Republic.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/17/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 3 (Roll no. 89).(text: CR 3/16/2005 H1529-1530)
01/06/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
03/09/2006HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules,.
03/09/2006HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
03/08/2006HouseSubcommittee on Africa, Global Human Rights and International Operations Discharged.
03/02/2006HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Human Rights and International Operations.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
03/17/2005SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
03/17/2005-4:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/17/2005-4:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 3 (Roll no. 89). (text: CR 3/16/2005 H1529-1530)
03/17/2005-4:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1674-1675)
03/16/2005-12:32pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/16/2005-12:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 18.
03/16/2005-12:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1529-1532)
03/16/2005-12:18pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
03/02/2005HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House International Relations Subcommittee on Middle East and Central Asia
03/02/2005HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House International Relations Subcommittee on Middle East and Central Asia
01/26/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and Central Asia.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
01/06/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
01/06/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/06/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/26/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/26/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/26/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/26/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 01/26/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/26/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/26/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/01/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/01/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/01/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/01/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/01/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/01/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/02/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/02/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/15/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/10/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations01/06/2005 Referred to
03/09/2006 Markup by
House International Relations Subcommittee on Middle East and Central Asia01/26/2005 Referred to
03/02/2005 Markup by
03/02/2005 Reported by
House International Relations Subcommittee on Africa, Global Human Rights and International Operations03/02/2006 Referred to
03/08/2006 Discharged from
Senate Foreign Relations03/17/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.18.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.18. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/17/2005)

Condemns the consistent pattern of gross human rights violations by the Government of the Syrian Arab Republic.

Calls on the international community to adopt a resolution at the upcoming session of the United Nations (UN) Commission on Human Rights which details the dismal human rights record of Syria.

Expresses congressional support for the Syrian people in their struggle for freedom, respect for human rights and civil liberties, democratic self-governance, and the establishment of the rule of law.

Encourages the President and the Secretary of State to assist dissidents, human rights activists, and the nonviolent democratic opposition in Syria.

Urges the adoption and pursuit of these and other policies to seek a democratic government in Syria that will: (1) bring freedom to the Syrian people; (2) cease the illegal Syrian occupation of the Lebanese Republic; (3) abandon Syrian support for terrorism; (4) not pursue development or transfer of biological, chemical, or nuclear weapons, and permit international observers to verify such assurances; and (5) live in peace and security with the international community.