Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/06/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/26/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/26/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/26/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/26/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 01/26/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/26/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/26/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/01/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/01/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/01/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/01/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/01/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/01/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/02/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/02/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/15/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/10/2005