Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/17/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/20/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/22/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/22/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/22/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/22/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/27/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/11/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/19/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/20/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/25/2005