Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/22/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/29/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/29/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/29/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/29/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/29/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/29/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/29/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/06/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/25/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/25/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/25/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/18/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/29/2006