Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/23/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/23/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/23/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/23/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/19/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/20/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/22/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/27/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/27/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/07/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/19/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/19/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/19/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/24/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/24/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 10/26/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/01/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/01/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/03/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/16/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/16/2005