Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/12/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/12/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/12/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/12/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/12/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/18/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/18/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/18/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/18/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/18/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/18/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/18/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/18/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/18/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/18/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/18/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/18/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/18/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/18/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/18/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/18/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/18/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/18/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/18/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/18/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/18/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/18/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/18/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/20/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/22/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/22/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/22/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/22/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/22/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/22/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/22/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/22/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/22/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/22/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/15/2005