Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/19/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/28/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/28/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/13/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/13/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/13/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/26/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/26/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/26/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/26/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/26/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/26/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/26/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/26/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/26/2005