Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/18/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/18/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/18/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/18/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/18/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/20/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/20/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/27/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/27/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/27/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/27/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/27/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/27/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/27/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/28/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/08/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/08/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/08/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/08/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/08/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/08/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/08/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/15/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/15/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/15/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/20/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/20/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/20/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/20/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/20/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/20/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/20/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/20/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/20/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22] 09/20/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/20/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/20/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/20/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/20/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/22/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/22/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/22/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/22/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/22/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/22/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/22/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/22/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/22/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/22/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/22/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/22/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/22/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/07/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/07/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/07/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/20/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/20/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/20/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/20/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/20/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/20/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/04/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/04/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/04/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/04/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/04/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/18/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/18/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/18/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/15/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/15/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/14/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/25/2006