Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/21/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/21/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/21/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/26/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/26/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/26/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/26/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/26/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/06/2005