Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/06/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/15/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/06/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/14/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/14/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 12/13/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/03/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/14/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/11/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/18/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/18/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/20/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/19/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/21/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/21/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/21/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/21/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/21/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/21/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/21/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/27/2006