Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 09/07/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/07/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/08/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/13/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/13/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/13/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/27/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 12/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/25/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/25/2006