Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/06/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/06/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/06/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/13/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/13/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/13/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/13/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/13/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/13/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/13/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/13/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/13/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/13/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/13/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/13/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/13/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/13/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/13/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/14/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/14/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/14/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/20/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/20/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/20/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/20/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/20/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/20/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/20/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/20/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/20/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/20/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/20/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/20/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/20/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/20/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/20/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/20/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/20/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/26/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/26/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/28/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/28/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/03/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/24/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/09/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/11/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/06/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/06/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/07/2006