Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/21/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/21/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/21/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/21/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/21/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/21/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/21/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/21/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/21/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/21/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/21/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/21/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/21/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/21/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/21/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/21/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/21/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/21/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/21/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/21/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/21/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/21/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/21/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/21/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/22/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/22/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/22/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/22/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/22/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/22/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/22/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/22/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/22/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/22/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/22/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/26/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/26/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/26/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/26/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/26/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/26/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/26/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/26/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/26/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/26/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/26/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/26/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/26/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/26/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/26/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/26/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/26/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/26/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/27/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/27/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/27/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/28/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/28/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/28/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/28/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/29/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/29/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/29/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/06/2005