Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/29/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/29/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/29/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/29/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/29/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/07/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/07/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/07/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/07/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 10/19/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/19/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/19/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/27/2005