Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/07/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/07/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/07/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/07/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/07/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/07/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/07/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/07/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/07/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/07/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/17/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/17/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/17/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 10/18/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/18/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/18/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/18/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/18/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/18/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/18/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/20/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/20/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/20/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/25/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/25/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/25/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/27/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/27/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/27/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/27/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/28/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/28/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/03/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/04/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/04/2005