Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 10/18/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 10/18/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/25/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/25/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/25/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/25/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/25/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/26/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 10/26/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/26/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/26/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/26/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 10/26/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/26/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/26/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/26/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/28/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/08/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/08/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 11/08/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/08/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 11/08/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/08/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/15/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/15/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/15/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/15/2005