Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 10/25/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/25/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 10/25/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 10/25/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/26/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/26/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/26/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/26/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/26/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 10/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/04/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/04/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/04/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/09/2005