Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/17/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/17/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/17/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/17/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/14/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/16/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/16/2006
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/30/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/30/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/30/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/22/2006