Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/03/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/03/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/03/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/03/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/03/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/03/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/03/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/03/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/03/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/03/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/18/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/08/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/08/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/16/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/31/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/15/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/30/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/03/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/03/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/13/2006